WA SB5747 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the statewide master oil and hazardous substance spill prevention and contingency plan.
Title
Concerning the statewide master oil and hazardous substance spill prevention and contingency plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Chapter 54, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-18 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |