WA SB5744 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax deferrals for investment projects in clean technology manufacturing, clean alternative fuels production, and renewable energy storage.
Title
Concerning tax deferrals for investment projects in clean technology manufacturing, clean alternative fuels production, and renewable energy storage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1988 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
82 | 08 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |