WA SB5740 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the secure choice retirement savings program.
Title
Creating the secure choice retirement savings program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-01-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-01-17 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-08 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |