WA SB5740 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-07 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
Pending: Senate Human Services & Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-07 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
Pending: Senate Human Services & Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing predatory guardianships of incapacitated adults.
Title
Preventing predatory guardianships of incapacitated adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2011-04-22 | Returned to Senate Rules 3. | |
2011-04-19 | House insists on its position and asks Senate to recede. | |
2011-04-18 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-24 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2011-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-09 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |