WA SB5735 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM
Pending: House Human Services & Early Learning Committee
Hearing: Mar 22 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the appropriate age for juvenile court adjudication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the appropriate age for juvenile court adjudication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback