WA SB5734 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bringing Washington state government contracting provisions into compliance with federal law as it relates to small works bonding requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bringing Washington state government contracting provisions into compliance with federal law as it relates to small works bonding requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-20SenateChapter 75, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-20SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-14SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2017-04-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-04-03HouseCB - Majority; do pass.
2017-04-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
2017-03-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:30 AM.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Capital Budget.
2017-03-22HouseSEIT - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 9:00 AM.
2017-03-17HouseExecutive session in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
2017-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-01HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology
2017-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-24SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-17SenateSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-06SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback