WA SB5731 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning organic materials management.
Title
Concerning organic materials management.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1799 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 30 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 155 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 21b | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 80 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 80 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 205 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 455 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 900 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 08 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5731&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5731.pdf |