WA SB5730 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing federal financing of health coverage.
Title
Enhancing federal financing of health coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-20 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-20 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-20 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |