WA SB5724 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning organ transport vehicles.
Title
Concerning organ transport vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 12:30 PM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 73 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 73 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 73 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 37 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 37 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 37 | 670 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 52 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 64 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |