WA SB5722 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing greenhouse gas emissions in buildings.
Title
Reducing greenhouse gas emissions in buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 177, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1774 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 27a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 27a | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |