WA SB5714 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a sales and use tax deferral program for solar canopies placed on large-scale commercial parking lots and other similar areas.
Title
Creating a sales and use tax deferral program for solar canopies placed on large-scale commercial parking lots and other similar areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 161, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-03-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-03-08 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-03-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:00 PM. |
2022-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | New Code | See Bill Text |