WA SB5713 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the skilled worker outreach, recruitment, and key training program.
Title
Creating the skilled worker outreach, recruitment, and key training program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chapter 225, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2017-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-03-29 | House | HE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | HIE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1949 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.