WA SB5710 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing contamination in the state toxicology laboratory.
Title
Reducing contamination in the state toxicology laboratory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |