WA SB5705 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a mineral prospecting and mining advisory committee.
Title
Establishing a mineral prospecting and mining advisory committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-06 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2015-03-25 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |