WA SB5704 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring health carriers to reimburse advanced registered nurse practitioners at the same rate as physicians for the same services.
Title
Requiring health carriers to reimburse advanced registered nurse practitioners at the same rate as physicians for the same services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 05 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |