WA SB5703 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use and disclosure of toxic chemicals in cosmetic products.
Title
Concerning the use and disclosure of toxic chemicals in cosmetic products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1853 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | New Code | See Bill Text |