WA SB5700 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing search and arrest authority provisions of offenders by department of corrections personnel.
Title
Establishing search and arrest authority provisions of offenders by department of corrections personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Brandland [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Val Stevens [R] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-25 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1792 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.