WA SB5697 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Renewing Washington's recycling system and reducing waste.
Title
Renewing Washington's recycling system and reducing waste.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2003 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-17 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21b | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 205 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |