WA SB5689 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making supplemental transportation appropriations for the 2021-2023 fiscal biennium.
Title
Making supplemental transportation appropriations for the 2021-2023 fiscal biennium.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 3/25/2022. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 186, 2022 Laws PV. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senators King, Liias, Saldaa; Representatives Barkis, Fey, Wylie. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 2:35 PM 3/9/2022. |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Representatives Barkis, Fey, Wylie; Senators King, Liias, Saldaa. |
2022-03-09 | House | Conference committee report; received 1:43 PM 3/9/2022. |
2022-03-07 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Fey, Barkis, Wylie. |
2022-03-07 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Liias, Saldaa, King. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2022-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-26 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:00 PM. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1786 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 68 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 68 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |