WA SB5683 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the welcome to Washington baby act to create family supports through universal home visiting programs and a statewide family linkage program for resources and referrals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the welcome to Washington baby act to create family supports through universal home visiting programs and a statewide family linkage program for resources and referrals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-12SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-12SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:05 PM.
2019-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1771 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-22 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback