WA SB5676 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a benefit increase to certain retirees of the public employees' retirement system plan 1 and the teachers' retirement system plan 1.
Title
Providing a benefit increase to certain retirees of the public employees' retirement system plan 1 and the teachers' retirement system plan 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Chapter 52, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1721 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 32 | 4992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 40 | 1987 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |