WA SB5676 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting personal voter signatures.
Title
Protecting personal voter signatures.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |