WA SB5674 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining affordable housing for purposes of using surplus public property for public benefit.
Title
Defining affordable housing for purposes of using surplus public property for public benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | HSG - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1695 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.