WA SB5662 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the cannabis employee job retention act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the cannabis employee job retention act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2024-01-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2024-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2024-01-30SenateLC - Majority; do pass.
2024-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5662&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5662.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5662%20SBA%20LC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66758
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67713
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5662%20SBR%20LC%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5662%20SBR%20LC%20OC%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128751&actionText=LC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31853&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback