WA SB5659 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the eligibility of emergency medical technicians employed by public hospital districts for membership in the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system.
Title
Addressing the eligibility of emergency medical technicians employed by public hospital districts for membership in the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1932 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.