WA SB5658 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recyclability of products and packaging.
Title
Concerning the recyclability of products and packaging.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1932 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-12 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 245 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |