WA SB5653 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the commission on pesticide registration to the commission on integrated pest management.
Title
Changing the name of the commission on pesticide registration to the commission on integrated pest management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 92 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 92 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 92 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 92 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 92 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |