WA SB5648 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Housing & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Housing & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerning accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 698 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |