WA SB5646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning services provided by residential habilitation centers.
Title
Concerning services provided by residential habilitation centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Effective date 10/19/2017. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 19, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-28 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-13 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |