WA SB5644 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning providing quality behavioral health co-response services
Title
Concerning providing quality behavioral health co-response services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 232, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 11:30 AM. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
MENTAL HEALTH
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)
SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER
WORKER TRAINING AND WORKFORCE NEEDS
MENTAL HEALTH
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)
SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER
WORKER TRAINING AND WORKFORCE NEEDS