WA SB5627 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of commuter air carriers.
Title
Concerning the taxation of commuter air carriers.
Sponsors
Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 56, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-01 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-01 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1710 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Finance.