WA SB5623 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the operation of motorcycles on roadways laned for traffic.
Title
Modifying the operation of motorcycles on roadways laned for traffic.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1515 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.