WA SB5613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Local Government
Hearing: Feb 28 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authority of counties to vacate a county road that abuts on a body of water if the county road is hazardous or creates a significant risk to public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the authority of counties to vacate a county road that abuts on a body of water if the county road is hazardous or creates a significant risk to public safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM
2020-02-26HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM
2020-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2020-01-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2020-01-21HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-03HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-20HouseLG - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2019-02-20SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-20SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-13SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback