WA SB5610 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the release of driving record abstracts for employment and risk management purposes.
Title
Authorizing the release of driving record abstracts for employment and risk management purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Berkey [D] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-29 | Chapter 276, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-29 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-15 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-02 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-02 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-02 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-27 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-18 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |