WA SB5606 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the use of air conditioning in adult family homes.
Title
Expanding the use of air conditioning in adult family homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |