WA SB5605 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning the office of the superintendent of public instruction's background check authority with that of the department of early learning.
Title
Aligning the office of the superintendent of public instruction's background check authority with that of the department of early learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Effective date 10/19/2017. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 33, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |