WA SB5603 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring driver training curriculum to include instruction on sharing the road with large vehicles, including commercial motor vehicles and buses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring driver training curriculum to include instruction on sharing the road with large vehicles, including commercial motor vehicles and buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-10SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2023-02-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-02-16SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-27SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1540 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-06 - Effective date 4/1/2024.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4682420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback