WA SB5600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning residential tenant protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning residential tenant protections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 356, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-24SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-24SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 46; absent, 1; excused, 1.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2019-03-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-09SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-09Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-18SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-18SenateHSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5600&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5600.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5600-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5600-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5600-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5600-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118484&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5600&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118484&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5600&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118484&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5600&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback