WA SB5598 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sustainable funding for the derelict vessel removal account using the vessel watercraft excise tax.
Title
Concerning sustainable funding for the derelict vessel removal account using the vessel watercraft excise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1700 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.