WA SB5597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electronic payments to the division of child support when remitting funds in response to an order to withhold income.
Title
Concerning electronic payments to the division of child support when remitting funds in response to an order to withhold income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2188 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5597&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5597.pdf |