WA SB5597 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Investigating Washington's ocean renewable energy resources.
Title
Investigating Washington's ocean renewable energy resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-25 | EWE - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5597&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5597.pdf |