WA SB5593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing equity in access to dual credit opportunities.
Title
Addressing equity in access to dual credit opportunities.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |