WA SB5585 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Setting domestic wastewater discharge fees.
Title
Setting domestic wastewater discharge fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 227, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |