WA SB5582 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the deadline for a port commission to send new district boundaries to the county auditor when expanding from three commissioners to five.
Title
Concerning the deadline for a port commission to send new district boundaries to the county auditor when expanding from three commissioners to five.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Chapter 47, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-18 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 12 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 12 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |