WA SB5581 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Effective date 3/14/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Improving the effectiveness and adequacy of state tax laws by clarifying and simplifying nexus provisions, by decreasing compliance and administrative burdens for taxpayers and the department of revenue, by facilitating the collection of new tax revenue resulting from the United States supreme court's decision in South Dakota v. Wayfair, Inc., by providing more consistent tax obligations for both domestic and foreign sellers, and by simplifying the expiration of sales tax sourcing mitigation payments to local governments on September 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving the effectiveness and adequacy of state tax laws by clarifying and simplifying nexus provisions, by decreasing compliance and administrative burdens for taxpayers and the department of revenue, by facilitating the collection of new tax revenue resulting from the United States supreme court's decision in South Dakota v. Wayfair, Inc., by providing more consistent tax obligations for both domestic and foreign sellers, and by simplifying the expiration of sales tax sourcing mitigation payments to local governments on September 30, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateEffective date 3/14/2019*.
2019-03-14SenateChapter 8, 2019 Laws.
2019-03-14SenateGovernor signed.
2019-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2019-03-11SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08HouseCommittee amendment
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-25HouseFIN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2019-02-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-02-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-15Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-07SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB1890 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - First reading, referred to Finance.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5581&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5581.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5581-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5581-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5581-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118465&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5581&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118465&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5581&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118465&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5581&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback