WA SB5572 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the recommendations of the Washington state internet crimes against children task force.
Title
Implementing the recommendations of the Washington state internet crimes against children task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 68a | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 68a | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |