WA SB5570 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revised for 1st Substitute: Authorizing consumer-owned utilities to establish energy efficiency revolving loan programs.Original: Authorizing electric utilities to establish energy efficiency revolving loan programs.
Title
Revised for 1st Substitute: Authorizing consumer-owned utilities to establish energy efficiency revolving loan programs.Original: Authorizing electric utilities to establish energy efficiency revolving loan programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |