WA SB5564 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the confidentiality of employees using employee assistance programs.
Title
Protecting the confidentiality of employees using employee assistance programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chapter 11, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |