WA SB5561 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating disclosure of information regarding treatment or care of minors.
Title
Regulating disclosure of information regarding treatment or care of minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] |
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5561&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5561.pdf |