WA SB5560 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mediation of disputes between elected officials.
Title
Concerning mediation of disputes between elected officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 463, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |